Senate | 06/28/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/19/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/19/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/13/2019 | Public Act 19-50 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 06/01/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 660 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/31/2019 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 05/31/2019 | House Passed | ||
House | 05/31/2019 | Removed from Foot of Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/20/2019 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | File Number 98 | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | House Calendar Number 88 | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/07/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/06/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/22/2019 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
House | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |