House | 06/03/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/29/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/29/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/28/2019 | Public Act 19-5 | ||
House | 05/23/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/23/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/23/2019 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8738 | ||
House | 05/23/2019 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 8754 | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 472 | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | File Number 429 | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | House Calendar Number 281 | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/04/2019 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 02/22/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |