House
|
06/03/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Public Act 19-6
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 9372
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
File Number 867
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 473
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8074
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
File Number 485
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
House Calendar Number 312
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2019
|
Public Hearing 03/11
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|