House | 05/15/2019 | No Action | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | File Number 825 | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | House Calendar Number 525 | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/22/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/12/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/12/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/01/2019 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
House | 02/22/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |