House
|
06/03/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Public Act 19-7
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,C,D
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 8740
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 9148
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 8744
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,C,D
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
File Number 871
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 476
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,C,D
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule D 8223
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule C 8187
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 8162
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8067
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
File Number 486
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
House Calendar Number 313
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2019
|
Public Hearing 03/11
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|