House
|
06/28/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2019
|
Public Act 19-51
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
File Number 817
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 425
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7376
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
File Number 199
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
House Calendar Number 149
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2019
|
Public Hearing 03/05
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
|
|
|