House | 05/16/2019 | File Number 906 | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 498 | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8044 | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | File Number 294 | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | House Calendar Number 202 | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/01/2019 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
House | 02/27/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |