House | 04/22/2019 | No Action | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | File Number 488 | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | House Calendar Number 315 | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/01/2019 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
House | 02/27/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |