House | 05/15/2019 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/15/2019 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/15/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/13/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | File Number 251 | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | House Calendar Number 169 | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/01/2019 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
House | 02/28/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |