House
|
07/09/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2019
|
Special Act 19-25
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2019
|
File Number 769
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 375
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7038
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2019
|
File Number 296
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2019
|
House Calendar Number 204
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2019
|
Public Hearing 03/05
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|