House | 04/25/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 408 | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | File Number 299 | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | House Calendar Number 207 | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/01/2019 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
House | 02/28/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |