House | 05/16/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 509 | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | File Number 846 | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | House Calendar Number 529 | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/12/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/12/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/14/2019 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
House | 02/28/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |