Connecticut 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB07282 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 06/25/2019

                             
 
 
House Bill No. 7282 
 
Public Act No. 19-176 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING NE WBORN SCREENING FOR SPINAL 
MUSCULAR ATROPHY. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 19a-55 of the general statutes is repealed and the 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2019): 
(a) The administrative officer or other person in charge of each 
institution caring for newborn infants shall cause to have administered 
to every such infant in its care an HIV-related test, as defined in section 
19a-581, a test for phenylketonuria and other metabolic diseases, 
hypothyroidism, galactosemia, sickle cell disease, maple syrup urine 
disease, homocystinuria, biotinidase deficiency, congenital adrenal 
hyperplasia, severe combined immunodeficiency disease, 
adrenoleukodystrophy and such other tests for inborn errors of 
metabolism as shall be prescribed by the Department of Public Health. 
The tests shall be administered as soon after birth as is medically 
appropriate. If the mother has had an HIV-related test pursuant to 
section 19a-90 or 19a-593, the person responsible for testing under this 
section may omit an HIV-related test. The Commissioner of Public 
Health shall (1) administer the newborn screening program, (2) direct 
persons identified through the screening program to appropriate 
specialty centers for treatments, consistent with any applicable  House Bill No. 7282 
 
Public Act No. 19-176 	2 of 3 
 
confidentiality requirements, and (3) set the fees to be charged to 
institutions to cover all expenses of the comprehensive screening 
program including testing, tracking and treatment. The fees to be 
charged pursuant to subdivision (3) of this subsection shall be set at a 
minimum of ninety-eight dollars. The Commissioner of Public Health 
shall publish a list of all the abnormal conditions for which the 
department screens newborns under the newborn screening program, 
which shall include screening for amino acid disorders, organic acid 
disorders and fatty acid oxidation disorders, including, but not limited 
to, long-chain 3-hydroxyacyl CoA dehydrogenase (L-CHAD) and 
medium-chain acyl-CoA dehydrogenase (MCAD). 
(b) In addition to the testing requirements prescribed in subsection 
(a) of this section, the administrative officer or other person in charge 
of each institution caring for newborn infants shall cause to have 
administered to (1) every such infant in its care a screening test for (A) 
cystic fibrosis, [and] (B) critical congenital heart disease, and (C) on 
and after January 1, 2020, spinal muscular atrophy, and (2) any 
newborn infant who fails a newborn hearing screening, as described in 
section 19a-59, a screening test for cytomegalovirus, provided such 
screening test shall be administered within available appropriations. 
[on and after January 1, 2016. On and after January 1, 2018, the] The 
administrative officer or other person in charge of each institution 
caring for newborn infants who performs the testing for critical 
congenital heart disease shall enter the results of such test into the 
newborn screening system pursuant to section 19a-53. Such screening 
tests shall be administered as soon after birth as is medically 
appropriate. 
(c) The administrative officer or other person in charge of each 
institution caring for newborn infants shall report any case of 
cytomegalovirus that is confirmed as a result of a screening test 
administered pursuant to subdivision (2) of subsection (b) of this  House Bill No. 7282 
 
Public Act No. 19-176 	3 of 3 
 
section to the Department of Public Health in a form and manner 
prescribed by the Commissioner of Public Health. 
(d) The provisions of this section shall not apply to any infant whose 
parents object to the test or treatment as being in conflict with their 
religious tenets and practice. The commissioner shall adopt 
regulations, in accordance with the provisions of chapter 54, to 
implement the provisions of this section.