Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 675
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2019
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 10439
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Public Hearing 05/28
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9477
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
File Number 491
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
House Calendar Number 318
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2019
|
Public Hearing 03/06
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
|
|
|