House | 04/17/2019 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | File Number 617 | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | House Calendar Number 371 | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Public Hearing 03/22 | ||
House | 03/01/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |