House | 04/25/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 414 | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | File Number 495 | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | House Calendar Number 322 | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/22/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/07/2019 | Public Hearing 03/12 | ||
House | 03/01/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |