Connecticut 2019 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB07293 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/04/2019

                        
 
LCO No. 4814  	1 of 3 
  
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 7293  
January Session, 2019  
LCO No. 4814 
 
 
Referred to Committee on ENVIRONMENT  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(ENV)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TH E REDEVELOPMENT OF CER TAIN SOLID 
WASTE MANAGEMENT FAC ILITIES. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 22a-268g of the general statutes is repealed and 1 
the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage): 2 
On or before January 1, 2016, the Commissioner of Energy and 3 
Environmental Protection, in consultation with the Materials 4 
Innovation and Recycling Authority, shall issue a request for proposals 5 
from providers of solid waste materials management services, 6 
including, but not limited to, recycling, reuse, energy and fuel recovery 7 
for the purpose of redeveloping the Connecticut Solid Waste System 8 
Project. Such proposals shall not include the provision of waste 9 
collection or transportation services. From such proposals, the 10 
commissioner may select not more than three respondents who may 11 
each conduct a feasibility study with the cooperation of the Materials 12 
Innovation and Recycling Authority. Any such feasibility study shall 13 
be completed not later than January 1, 2017, and any such respondent 14 
shall submit a final proposal to the Commissioner of Energy and 15  Raised Bill No.  7293 
 
 
 
LCO No. 4814   	2 of 3 
 
Environmental Protection not later than July 1, 2017. The 16 
commissioner shall provide an opportunity for public review and 17 
comment on such feasibility study. On or before September 15, 2017, 18 
the commissioner shall submit a report on the nature and status of 19 
such proposals to the joint standing committees of the General 20 
Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to the environment 21 
and energy and technology and to the joint standing committee on 22 
legislative management. The joint standing committees of the General 23 
Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to the environment 24 
and energy and technology may hold a joint public hearing on such 25 
report not later than thirty days after receipt of such report. The 26 
commissioner, or the commissioner's designee, shall testify at any such 27 
public hearing and receive comments from the members of said 28 
committees concerning such proposals. [On or before December 31, 29 
2017, the] Notwithstanding any other provision of the general statutes, 30 
the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection may select 31 
one such final proposal and [direct] order, pursuant to section 22a-208, 32 
the Materials Innovation and Recycling Authority to enter into an 33 
agreement with the applicable respondent for the redevelopment of 34 
the Connecticut Solid Waste Management System Project. In selecting 35 
such final proposal, the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental 36 
Protection shall consider the following factors: (1) Whether the 37 
proposal is consistent with the strategies developed pursuant to 38 
section 22a-241a, (2) whether the proposal is consistent with the goals 39 
of the state-wide solid waste management plan adopted in accordance 40 
with section 22a-228, (3) whether the proposal is in the best interest of 41 
the municipalities under contract with the Materials Innovation and 42 
Recycling Authority, including, but not limited to, the maintenance or 43 
reduction of current tipping fees for contracted waste, (4) the level of 44 
investment proposed by the respondent, (5) any potential positive 45 
impacts on the state's economic development, (6) public comments 46 
received on the feasibility studies, and (7) any other factor consistent 47 
with the purpose of this section that the Commissioner of Energy and 48 
Environmental Protection deems relevant to the redevelopment of the 49 
Connecticut Solid Waste System Project. The selection of a final 50  Raised Bill No.  7293 
 
 
 
LCO No. 4814   	3 of 3 
 
proposal by the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection, 51 
in consultation with the Materials Innovation and Recycling Authority, 52 
shall not be construed as a legislative mandate as it relates to the 53 
Materials Innovation and Recycling Authority's ability to obligate 54 
municipal customers to remain under contract.  55 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 from passage 22a-268g 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To provide that the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental 
Protection may issue an order requiring the execution of a contract for 
the redevelopment of the Connecticut Solid Waste System Project. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, 
except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is 
not underlined.]