Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 665
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10256
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
File Number 561
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
House Calendar Number 343
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2019
|
Public Hearing 03/11
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|