House | 05/22/2019 | File Number 971 | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 586 | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/20/2019 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/20/2019 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7411 | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | File Number 581 | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | House Calendar Number 354 | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
House | 03/06/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |