House
|
07/08/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2019
|
Public Act 19-178
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
File Number 995
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 597
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9262
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
File Number 355
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
House Calendar Number 233
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2019
|
Public Hearing 03/12
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|