House | 04/25/2019 | File Number 783 | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | House Calendar Number 491 | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/12/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/12/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/14/2019 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
House | 03/07/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |