10 | 18 | | |
---|
11 | 19 | | |
---|
12 | 20 | | AN ACT INCREASING FUNDING FOR ELDERLY NUTRITION, |
---|
13 | 21 | | ENSURING EQUITABLE R ATES FOR PROVIDERS O F MEALS ON |
---|
14 | 22 | | WHEELS AND COLLECTIN G DATA ON MALNUTRITION. |
---|
15 | 23 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General |
---|
16 | 24 | | Assembly convened: |
---|
17 | 25 | | |
---|
18 | 26 | | Section 1. Section 17b-343 of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 |
---|
19 | 27 | | following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2019): 2 |
---|
20 | 28 | | The Commissioner of Social Services shall establish annually the 3 |
---|
21 | 29 | | maximum allowable rate to be paid by agencies for homemaker 4 |
---|
22 | 30 | | services, chore person services, companion services, respite care, meals 5 |
---|
23 | 31 | | on wheels, adult day care services, case management and assessment 6 |
---|
24 | 32 | | services, transportation, mental health counseling and elderly foster 7 |
---|
25 | 33 | | care. [, except that the maximum allowable rates in effect July 1, 1990, 8 |
---|
26 | 34 | | shall remain in effect during the fiscal years ending June 30, 1992, and 9 |
---|
27 | 35 | | June 30, 1993.] The Commissioner of Social Services shall prescribe 10 |
---|
28 | 36 | | uniform forms on which agencies providing such services shall report 11 |
---|
29 | 37 | | their costs for such services. Such rates shall be determined on the 12 |
---|
30 | 38 | | basis of a reasonable payment for necessary services rendered. The 13 |
---|
31 | 39 | | maximum allowable rates established by the Commissioner of Social 14 |
---|
32 | 40 | | Services for the Connecticut home-care program for the elderly 15 |
---|
44 | 51 | | adult day care services, case management and assessment services, 21 |
---|
45 | 52 | | transportation, mental health counseling and elderly foster care. The 22 |
---|
46 | 53 | | commissioner may annually increase [any fee in] the fee schedule 23 |
---|
47 | 54 | | based on an increase in the cost of services. The commissioner shall 24 |
---|
48 | 55 | | increase the fee schedule effective July 1, 2000, by not less than five per 25 |
---|
49 | 56 | | cent, for adult day care services. The commissioner shall increase the 26 |
---|
50 | 57 | | fee schedule effective July 1, 2011, by four dollars per person, per day 27 |
---|
51 | 58 | | for adult day care services. Effective July 1, 2019, and annually 28 |
---|
52 | 59 | | thereafter, the commissioner shall increase the fee schedule for meals 29 |
---|
53 | 60 | | on wheels providers serving participants in the Connecticut home-care 30 |
---|
54 | 61 | | program for the elderly by, at minimum, the cost-of-living adjustment 31 |
---|
55 | 62 | | as measured by the consumer price index. The commissioner may 32 |
---|
56 | 63 | | increase any fee payable to a meals on wheels provider upon the 33 |
---|
57 | 64 | | application of such provider evidencing extraordinary costs related to 34 |
---|
58 | 65 | | delivery of meals on wheels in sparsely populated rural regions of the 35 |
---|
59 | 66 | | state. Nothing contained in this section shall authorize a payment by 36 |
---|
60 | 67 | | the state to any agency for such services in excess of the amount 37 |
---|
61 | 68 | | charged by such agency for such services to the general public. 38 |
---|
62 | 69 | | Sec. 2. Subsection (c) of section 17a-305 of the general statutes is 39 |
---|
63 | 70 | | repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 40 |
---|
64 | 71 | | 1, 2019): 41 |
---|
65 | 72 | | (c) The Department of Rehabilitation Services, in consultation with 42 |
---|
66 | 73 | | the five area agencies on aging [,] and elderly nutrition providers, shall 43 |
---|
67 | 74 | | review the method of allocation set forth in [subsection (a) of this 44 |
---|
68 | 75 | | section and shall report any findings or recommendations to the joint 45 |
---|
69 | 76 | | standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of 46 |
---|
70 | 77 | | matters relating to appropriations and the budgets of state agencies 47 |
---|
71 | 78 | | and human services] subsections (a) and (b) of this section and 48 |
---|
72 | 79 | | evaluate the formula used to allocate funding for elderly nutrition 49 |
---|
83 | 89 | | (2) any increased costs for providers that deliver meals on wheels in 54 |
---|
84 | 90 | | sparsely populated rural regions. Not later than July 1, 2021, the 55 |
---|
85 | 91 | | department shall report, in accordance with the provisions of section 56 |
---|
86 | 92 | | 11-4a, to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having 57 |
---|
87 | 93 | | cognizance of matters relating to aging, appropriations and the 58 |
---|
88 | 94 | | budgets of state agencies and human services on (A) the rates of 59 |
---|
89 | 95 | | reimbursement for each meals on wheels provider in the state 60 |
---|
90 | 96 | | compared to the costs to provide meals on wheels for each such 61 |
---|
91 | 97 | | provider, (B) the administrative expenses of each such meals on wheels 62 |
---|
92 | 98 | | provider, (C) the number of meals on wheels providers that have 63 |
---|
93 | 99 | | reduced or eliminated deliveries based on inadeq uate state 64 |
---|
94 | 100 | | reimbursement, and (D) any recommended changes in the method of 65 |
---|
95 | 101 | | allocation or funding formula. 66 |
---|
96 | | - | Sec. 3. Subsection (b) of section 19a-127l of the general statutes is 67 |
---|
97 | | - | repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 68 |
---|
98 | | - | 1, 2019): 69 |
---|
99 | | - | (b) In carrying out its responsibilities under subsection (a) of this 70 |
---|
100 | | - | section, the department shall develop the following for the quality of 71 |
---|
101 | | - | care program: 72 |
---|
102 | | - | (1) Comparable performance measures to be reported; 73 |
---|
103 | | - | (2) Selection of patient satisfaction survey measures and 74 |
---|
104 | | - | instruments; 75 |
---|
105 | | - | (3) Methods and format of standardized data collection; 76 |
---|
106 | | - | (4) Format for a public quality performance measurement report; 77 |
---|
107 | | - | (5) Human resources and quality measurements; 78 |
---|
108 | | - | (6) Medical error reduction methods; 79 |
---|
109 | | - | (7) Systems for sharing and implementing universally accepted best 80 |
---|
110 | | - | practices; 81 Substitute Bill No. 7338 |
---|
111 | | - | |
---|
112 | | - | |
---|
113 | | - | LCO {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-07338- |
---|
114 | | - | R01-HB.docx } |
---|
115 | | - | 4 of 4 |
---|
116 | | - | |
---|
117 | | - | (8) Systems for reporting outcome data; 82 |
---|
118 | | - | (9) Systems for continuum of care; 83 |
---|
119 | | - | (10) Recommendations concerning the use of an ISO 9000 quality 84 |
---|
120 | | - | auditing program; 85 |
---|
121 | | - | (11) Recommendations concerning the types of statutory protection 86 |
---|
122 | | - | needed prior to collecting any data or information under this section 87 |
---|
123 | | - | and sections 19a-127m and 19a-127n; [and] 88 |
---|
124 | | - | (12) Recommendations concerning the collection and analysis of 89 |
---|
125 | | - | data on patient malnutrition for the purposes of improving quality of 90 |
---|
126 | | - | care; and 91 |
---|
127 | | - | [(12)] (13) Any other issues that the department deems appropriate. 92 |
---|
| 102 | + | Sec. 3. Subdivision (12) of subsection (b) of section 19a-127l of the 67 |
---|
| 103 | + | general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu 68 |
---|
| 104 | + | thereof (Effective July 1, 2019): 69 |
---|
| 105 | + | (12) [Any] Recommendations concerning the collection and analysis 70 |
---|
| 106 | + | of data on patient malnutrition for the purposes of improving quality 71 |
---|
| 107 | + | of care and any other issues that the department deems appropriate. 72 |
---|