House | 05/16/2019 | File Number 908 | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 497 | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8239 | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | File Number 827 | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | House Calendar Number 527 | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/22/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/12/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/14/2019 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
House | 03/11/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |