House | 04/23/2019 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | File Number 655 | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | House Calendar Number 400 | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |