Senate | 05/31/2019 | File Number 1028 | ||
Senate | 05/31/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 650 | ||
Senate | 05/31/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 05/30/2019 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/30/2019 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7982 | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | File Number 786 | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | House Calendar Number 494 | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/12/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/14/2019 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |