House | 07/12/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/28/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/28/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/25/2019 | Public Act 19-185 | ||
House | 06/05/2019 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/05/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 480 | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | File Number 702 | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | House Calendar Number 438 | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/14/2019 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |