House | 05/24/2019 | File Number 996 | ||
House | 05/24/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 599 | ||
House | 05/24/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9384 | ||
House | 05/15/2019 | File Number 880 | ||
House | 05/15/2019 | House Calendar Number 589 | ||
House | 05/15/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/15/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/14/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 04/05/2019 | Public Hearing 04/10 | ||
House | 03/19/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |