House | 05/15/2019 | File Number 881 | ||
House | 05/15/2019 | House Calendar Number 590 | ||
House | 05/15/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/15/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/14/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/05/2019 | Public Hearing 04/10 | ||
House | 03/19/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |