House
|
07/08/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2019
|
Public Act 19-188
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
File Number 985
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 592
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9135
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
File Number 850
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
House Calendar Number 533
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Public Hearing 04/03
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|