Senate | 06/03/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 673 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 06/01/2019 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 06/01/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
House | 06/01/2019 | House Passed | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | File Number 949 | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | House Calendar Number 628 | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/21/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/13/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Public Hearing 04/29 | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |