Senate | 01/06/2020 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 01/02/2020 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 01/02/2020 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 12/23/2019 | Public Act 19-1 | ||
Senate | 12/18/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 12/18/2019 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 12/18/2019 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 11317 | ||
Senate | 12/18/2019 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 12/18/2019 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 12/18/2019 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 12/18/2019 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 11315 | ||
House | 12/17/2019 | Emergency Certification |