House | 05/16/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 503 | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Adopted, House | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | File Number 771 | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | House Calendar Number 478 | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/11/2019 | Public Hearing 03/15 | ||
House | 03/07/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |