House | 04/17/2019 | House Recommitted to Judiciary | ||
House | 02/14/2019 | File Number 1 | ||
House | 02/14/2019 | House Calendar Number 9 | ||
House | 02/14/2019 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 02/14/2019 | Favorable Report, House Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 02/14/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/07/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/13/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/05/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/01/2019 | House Favorable | ||
House | 01/28/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 01/25/2019 | Filed with House Clerks 01/23 |