House | 02/20/2019 | Adopted, House | ||
House | 02/15/2019 | File Number 4 | ||
House | 02/15/2019 | House Calendar Number 14 | ||
House | 02/15/2019 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 02/15/2019 | Favorable Report, House Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 02/15/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/15/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/21/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/13/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/11/2019 | House Favorable | ||
House | 01/29/2019 | Public Hearing 02/11 | ||
House | 01/28/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 01/25/2019 | Filed with House Clerks 01/25 |