House | 04/23/2019 | Adopted, House | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | File Number 708 | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | House Calendar Number 444 | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Favorable Report, House Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | House Favorable | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Public Hearing 04/15 | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | Filed with House Clerks 04/01 |