House | 05/29/2019 | Adopted, House | ||
House | 05/29/2019 | Rules Suspended | ||
House | 05/28/2019 | File Number 1011 | ||
House | 05/28/2019 | House Calendar Number 670 | ||
House | 05/28/2019 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/28/2019 | Favorable Report, House Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/28/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/28/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 06/03/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 05/28/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/28/2019 | House Favorable | ||
House | 05/24/2019 | Public Hearing 05/28 | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/21/2019 | Filed with House Clerks 05/18 |