Senate | 06/21/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/17/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/17/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/12/2019 | Public Act 19-26 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | House Calendar Number 456 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2019 | File Number 305 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 154 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
Senate | 03/06/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/08/2019 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |