House
|
05/28/2019
|
House Calendar Number 669
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Immediate Transmittal to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9788
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
File Number 308
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 162
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2019
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/07
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2019
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|