Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
House Calendar Number 656
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9632
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2019
|
File Number 209
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 127
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2019
|
Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/11
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2019
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2019
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|