Senate | 04/22/2019 | No Action | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | File Number 210 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 122 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/06/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing | ||
Senate | 03/05/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/19/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/01/2019 | Public Hearing 02/07 | ||
Senate | 01/29/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |