Senate | 06/21/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/17/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/17/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/12/2019 | Public Act 19-27 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | House Calendar Number 559 | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/09/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | File Number 829 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 430 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 04/12/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Public Hearing 03/29 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 01/23/2019 | Vote to Draft |