Senate | 04/30/2019 | File Number 853 | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 449 | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/12/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Public Hearing 04/01 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 01/23/2019 | Vote to Draft |