Senate | 02/08/2019 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 02/08/2019 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Change of Reference Public Health | ||
Senate | 01/28/2019 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on General Law | ||
Senate | 01/28/2019 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on General Law | ||
Senate | 01/25/2019 | Change of Reference General Law | ||
Senate | 01/17/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |