Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
Public Act 19-87
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2019
|
House Calendar Number 457
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7047
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
File Number 155
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 96
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2019
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2019
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/05
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2019
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|