Senate | 06/26/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/19/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/19/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/14/2019 | Public Act 19-65 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | House Calendar Number 641 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | File Number 854 | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 450 | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/12/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/12/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Public Hearing 04/03 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | Vote to Draft |