Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2019
|
Public Act 19-66
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
House Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
House Calendar Number 560
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
File Number 587
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 290
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2019
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2019
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/13
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2019
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|