Senate | 06/26/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/17/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/17/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/12/2019 | Public Act 19-28 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/26/2019 | House Calendar Number 502 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | File Number 45 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 46 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/06/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/26/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/08/2019 | Public Hearing 02/15 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
Senate | 02/06/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 01/25/2019 | Vote to Draft |