Senate | 03/12/2019 | File Number 46 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 47 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/06/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/26/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 01/30/2019 | Public Hearing 02/04 | ||
Senate | 01/29/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
Senate | 01/28/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 01/25/2019 | Vote to Draft |