Senate
|
06/21/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Public Act 19-18
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
House Calendar Number 511
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A 7546
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7546
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2019
|
File Number 47
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 48
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/04
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2019
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2019
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|