Senate | 05/22/2019 | House Calendar Number 643 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9112 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | File Number 713 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 358 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/20/2019 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |